House
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date: 07/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 592.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/05/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Conference committee report received.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Gary Smith, Morrell, and LaFleur.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Stokes, Abramson, and Davis.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 92, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/13/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Reported with amendments (13-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|