Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|