House
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 666.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 95, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 1. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/27/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Reported with amendments (16-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|