House | 04/25/2016 | Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 04/25/2016. | ||
House | 04/18/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 04/14/2016 | Reported favorably (11-0). | ||
House | 03/14/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 03/04/2016 | Prefiled. |