House
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date: 06/17/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 667.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Senate amendments, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, were concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/04/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/24/2016
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|