House
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date: 07/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 555.
|
|
|
House
|
06/07/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 25 yeas and 8 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Brown, Morrell, and Chabert.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Richard, Nancy Landry, and Gisclair.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 29 yeas and 6 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. Rules suspended. Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 1. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Reported favorably (11-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Read by title.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled. To be introduced at a later date.
|
|
|