House
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Peacock, Cortez, and Morrish.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
House conferees appointed: LeBas, Pearson, and Hoffmann.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
The amended bill was read by title, passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/05/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Reported with amendments (7-0).
|
|
|
House
|
03/16/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
Read by title.
|
|
|