House
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date: 06/17/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 622.
|
|
|
House
|
06/08/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/8/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Claitor, LaFleur, and White.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Notice House rejected the Senate amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
House conferees appointed: James, Jackson, and Magee.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/18/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Notice removed
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/14/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/11/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Reported favorably (12-4).
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 2/12/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
02/12/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|