House
|
06/09/2016
|
Effective date: 06/09/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/09/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 453.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 93, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/07/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
Read by title, substitute title adopted, lies over in the same order of business, substitute for HB No. 838 reported by the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works (15-0).
|
|
|