House
|
05/26/2016
|
Effective date: 02/01/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 183.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 5. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/28/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Reported with amendments (8-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Read by title.
|
|
|