House
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date: 01/01/2017.
|
|
|
House
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 559.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Rules suspended. Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 10 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably. Rules suspended. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 96, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/04/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Reported favorably (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Read by title.
|
|
|