House
|
06/05/2016
|
Effective date: 06/05/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 335.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Sent to the Governor for executive approval.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 96, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title, passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays, and ordered returned to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments which were read and adopted. Read by title and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Committee amendments read and adopted. Read by title and referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Revenue and Fiscal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 91, nays 0. Finally passed, title adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/20/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Ways and Means.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Read by title.
|
|
|