House
|
05/20/2016
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 86, nays 1, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Senate committee amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|