House
|
06/08/2016
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/8/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 98, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/06/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Conference Committee report received. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Mills, Barrow, and Claitor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Notice the House rejected the Senate amendments; House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
House conferees appointed: LeBas, Hoffmann, and Reynolds.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 88, nays 0, Senate amendments rejected, conference committee appointment pending.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Reported with amendments (10-0).
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|