House | 06/03/2016 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 29, nays 64. The resolution was rejected. | ||
House | 06/03/2016 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/02/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. | ||
House | 06/02/2016 | Notice given. | ||
House | 06/02/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 05/26/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016. | ||
House | 05/25/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/24/2016 | Reported favorably (5-3). | ||
House | 05/16/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 05/13/2016 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |