House | 06/06/2016 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
Senate | 05/31/2016 | Signed by the President of the Senate. | ||
House | 05/31/2016 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/26/2016 | Received from the Senate without amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/26/2016 | Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 30 yeas and 1 nays. Ordered returned to the House. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 05/18/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2016 | Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/16/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, adopted, ordered to the Senate. |