House
|
05/27/2016
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Received from the Senate without amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 31 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 98, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 04/12/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Reported favorably (14-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2016
|
Reported favorably (13-0), with the recommendation to recommit to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2016
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/22/2016
|
Discharged from the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2016
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2016
|
First appeared in the Interim Calendar on 3/4/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Under the rules, provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2016
|
Prefiled.
|
|
|