House
|
06/06/2016
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 93, nays 0, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Senate amendments read and adopted. Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 80, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered reengrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Reported with amendments (9-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Reported with amendments (14-0) To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|