House
|
05/20/2016
|
Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Read by title, roll called, yeas 64, nays 19, Senate amendments concurred in.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/17/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Received from the Senate with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Read by title and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 4 nays. Ordered returned to the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Senate Committee amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Rules suspended. Read by title. Recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Received in the Senate. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Read by title, amended, roll called on final consideration, yeas 95, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2016
|
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Reported with amendments (19-0).
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.
|
|
|