Senate | 05/11/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/10/2016 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/10/2016 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 90, nays 0. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/05/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016. | ||
House | 05/05/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Reported favorably (9-0). | ||
House | 04/28/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/27/2016 | Reported favorably (12-0). To be recommitted to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/25/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/21/2016 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |