Senate | 05/25/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Senate Committee amendments read and adopted. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Rules suspended. Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 05/17/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 05/16/2016 | Received in the Senate. Rules suspended. Read first time by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. | ||
House | 05/16/2016 | Read by title, roll called on final consideration, yeas 66, nays 20. The resolution was adopted and ordered to the Senate. | ||
House | 05/13/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/16/2016. | ||
House | 05/12/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/11/2016 | Reported favorably (9-0). | ||
House | 05/02/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
House | 04/28/2016 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |