LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2016 Regular Session
House
Bills
HR11
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HR11
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2016 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HR11
Action History
House
06/01/2016
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
House
05/26/2016
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016.
House
05/25/2016
Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading.
House
05/24/2016
Reported with amendments (7-0).
House
03/17/2016
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs.
House
03/16/2016
Read by title. Lies over under the rules.