ENROLLED 2016 Regular Session HOUSE RESOLUTION NO. 12 BY REPRESENTATIVE CONNICK A RESOLUTION To commend Edward Peter Benezech, Jr., on his service to his country in the United States Army during World War II. WHEREAS, Edward Peter Benezech, Jr., was born on January 17, 1919; he graduated from Warren Easton High School in New Orleans and attended Louisiana State University; and WHEREAS, he began active duty in the United States Army on December 13, 1941; he graduated from Artillery School at Fort Sill in Oklahoma; and WHEREAS, he honorably served as a staff officer and a field artillery battery commander during World War II; and WHEREAS, on August 20, 1943, he departed for service in Africa; on November 25, 1943, he arrived in Naples, Italy; his tour of duty ended in Austria at the end of the war; and WHEREAS, upon his return home from the war, Mr. Benezech was relieved from active duty at Fort Sill on April 16, 1946; he had attained the rank of captain; his service to the U.S. Army continued until his retirement in 1980 at the rank of lieutenant colonel; and WHEREAS, Mr. Benezech has been recognized for his courageous leadership and has received many awards and citations for his service in the Army, including the European African Eastern Service Medal with five Bronze Stars and a Bronze Arrowhead, a Bronze Star Medal, the Croix de Guerre with one Silver Star, the American Defense Service Medal, the American Service Medal, and the World War II Victory Medal; and WHEREAS, over the span of his career in the United States Army, Edward Peter Benezech, Jr., earned a reputation as an outstanding soldier, a superb leader, and a courageous warrior. Page 1 of 2 HR NO. 12 ENROLLED THEREFORE, BE IT RESOLVED that the House of Representatives of the Legislature of Louisiana does hereby commend Edward Peter Benezech, Jr., for his honorable service to his country in the United States Army during World War II and does hereby recognize the pride and honor that this extraordinary gentleman brings to his family and friends and to the state of Louisiana. BE IT FURTHER RESOLVED that a suitable copy of this Resolution be transmitted to Edward Peter Benezech, Jr. SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES Page 2 of 2