House | 05/27/2016 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 05/24/2016 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 05/23/2016 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 94, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/19/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 05/23/2016. | ||
House | 05/19/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/18/2016 | Reported favorably (8-0). | ||
House | 05/16/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education. | ||
House | 05/13/2016 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |