House | 06/06/2016 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/05/2016 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/03/2016 | Read by title, amended, roll called, yeas 63, nays 18. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/03/2016 | Called from the calendar. | ||
House | 06/03/2016 | Read by title, returned to the calendar. | ||
House | 06/02/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. | ||
House | 06/02/2016 | Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 06/02/2016 | Discharged from the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 05/19/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 05/18/2016 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |