House | 06/06/2016 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/05/2016 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/03/2016 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 99, nays 0. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 06/02/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016. | ||
House | 06/01/2016 | Read by title, amended, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/31/2016 | Reported with amendments (13-0). | ||
House | 05/24/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works. | ||
House | 05/23/2016 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |