House | 06/06/2016 | Taken by the Clerk of the House and presented to the Secretary of State in accordance with the Rules of the House. | ||
House | 06/02/2016 | Enrolled and signed by the Speaker of the House. | ||
House | 06/01/2016 | Read by title, roll called, yeas 84, nays 13. The resolution was adopted. | ||
House | 05/26/2016 | Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016. | ||
House | 05/25/2016 | Read by title, ordered engrossed, passed to 3rd reading. | ||
House | 05/24/2016 | Reported favorably (7-0). | ||
House | 04/26/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on House and Governmental Affairs. | ||
House | 04/25/2016 | Read by title. Lies over under the rules. |