LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2016 Regular Session
House
Bills
HSR3
Action History
LA
Louisiana House Bill HSR3
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2016 Regular Session
Louisiana House Bill HSR3
Action History
House
06/06/2016
Approved on 6/6/2016.
House
06/03/2016
Study request list distributed to members on 6/3/2016.
House
06/01/2016
Received on 6/1/2016.