House | 05/13/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure. | ||
House | 05/12/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/11/2016 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 04/11/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/06/2016 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/05/2016 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary A. |