Senate | 03/30/2016 | Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day. | ||
Senate | 03/29/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 11 yeas and 24 nays. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | Reported favorably. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. | ||
Senate | 03/03/2016 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Senate and Governmental Affairs. |