House
|
06/02/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 46, nays 51. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/02/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title, amended, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Reported with amendments (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 1 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|