House
|
05/26/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 33, nays 50. Failed to pass.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/26/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Notice given.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/24/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Reported favorably (7-6). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Judiciary C.
|
|
|