Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Effective date: See Act.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 93.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 83, nays 0. The bill, having received two-thirds vote of the elected members, was finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/09/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Reported with amendments (6-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
House
|
04/13/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Read by title; Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered reengrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2016
|
Rules suspended. Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted; ordered engrossed and recommitted to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2016
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Retirement.
|
|
|