Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Effective date 8/1/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 381.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 80, nays 7. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/18/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/09/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/21/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2016
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development.
|
|
|