Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Effective date 8/1/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 206.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/11/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Reported favorably (8-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 32 yeas and 0 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/07/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
The amended bill was read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted; read by title and returned to its regular order on third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Insurance.
|
|
|