Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Effective date 8/1/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 173.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/05/2016
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 78, nays 6. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Reported favorably (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 38 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|