House | 04/20/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Forestry, Aquaculture, and Rural Development. | ||
House | 04/19/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 04/18/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 12 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 04/14/2016 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/13/2016 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. | ||
Senate | 02/25/2016 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare. |