Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Effective date 5/9/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 13.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/03/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 86, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/02/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2016
|
Reported favorably (15-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Municipal, Parochial and Cultural Affairs.
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 34 yeas and 4 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2016
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Local and Municipal Affairs.
|
|
|