House | 05/26/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Judiciary. | ||
House | 05/26/2016 | Rules suspended. | ||
House | 05/26/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/25/2016 | Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/24/2016 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 05/23/2016 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/14/2016 | Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Finance. | ||
Senate | 03/04/2016 | Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Finance. |