Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Effective date 5/26/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 207.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/17/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 90, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Reported with amendments (12-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 2 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/23/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/22/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate; read by title. Rules suspended. Read second time and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2016
|
Prefiled and under the rules provisionally referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|