House | 05/05/2016 | Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice. | ||
House | 05/04/2016 | Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Read by title, passed by a vote of 23 yeas and 8 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled. | ||
Senate | 05/04/2016 | Called from the Calendar. | ||
Senate | 05/02/2016 | Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call. | ||
Senate | 04/27/2016 | Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage. | ||
Senate | 04/26/2016 | Reported with amendments. | ||
Senate | 03/23/2016 | Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary C. | ||
Senate | 03/22/2016 | Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading. |