House
|
05/11/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 22 yeas and 16 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Reconsidered. Read by title; returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Read by title. Failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 21 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/19/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/29/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|