Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date 8/1/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 535.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 89, nays 10. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported favorably (13-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways, and Public Works.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/17/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Transportation, Highways and Public Works.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|