LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Louisiana LA
Legislatures
2016 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB385
Action History
LA
Louisiana Senate Bill SB385
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Louisiana 2016 Regular Session
Louisiana Senate Bill SB385
Action History
Senate
04/25/2016
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
Senate
04/25/2016
Senate floor amendments read and adopted.
Senate
04/21/2016
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
Senate
04/20/2016
Reported with amendments.
Senate
04/05/2016
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Health and Welfare.
Senate
04/04/2016
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.