Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
Effective date 6/13/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/13/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 524.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/01/2016
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 35 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/31/2016
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 95, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/31/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/19/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/18/2016
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Natural Resources and Environment.
|
|
|
House
|
05/11/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 39 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Natural Resources.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|