House
|
06/20/2016
|
Notice: Senate sustained Governor's veto.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/20/2016
|
Veto message received and read. By a vote of 35 yeas and 0 nays, the veto of the Governor was sustained. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Vetoed by the Governor.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 94, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Read by title, rules suspended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/02/2016
|
Reported favorably (10-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Read by title, recommitted to the Committee on Judiciary.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Discharged from the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, rules suspended, read by title, referred to the Committee on Administration of Criminal Justice.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 33 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary B.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/04/2016
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|