Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Effective date 5/19/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 179.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/16/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 5/13/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/12/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Received from the House without amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/10/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 84, nays 1. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 05/10/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2016
|
Read by title, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Reported without Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Reported favorably (5-0-1). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Civil Law and Procedure.
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2016
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Judiciary A.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|