Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Effective date 7/1/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/17/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 589.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate on 6/8/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate on 6/7/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Notice of Senate adoption of Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read; adopted by a vote of 28 yeas and 8 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Notice House adopted the Conference Committee Report.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Conference Committee Report read, roll called, yeas 82, nays 0. The Conference Committee Report was adopted.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Conference Committee report received.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Notice House Conference Committee members appointed.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
House conferees appointed: Richard, Henry, and Gary Carter.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Notice of Senate conferees appointed.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Senate conference committee members appointed: Milkovich, Peterson, and LaFleur.
|
|
|
House
|
06/05/2016
|
Notice of Senate rejecting House amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and rejected by a vote of 36 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read third time by title, amended, roll called on final passage, yeas 99, nays 0. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Called from the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/03/2016
|
Read by title, returned to the calendar.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/03/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Rules suspended.
|
|
|
House
|
05/31/2016
|
Reported with amendments (12-2). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title and passed by a vote of 37 yeas and 0 nays; ordered reengrossed and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2016
|
Read by title. Committee amendments read and adopted. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported with amendments.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Finance.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|