House
|
05/24/2016
|
Involuntarily deferred in committee.
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
House
|
05/13/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
The bill, as previously amended, was read by title, passed by a vote of 24 yeas and 11 nays, ordered reengrossed, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/12/2016
|
Reconsidered.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Notice of reconsideration on the next legislative day.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Senate floor amendments read and adopted. Read by title; failed to pass by a vote of 17 yeas and 20 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Rules suspended. Called from the Calendar.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2016
|
Read by title and returned to the Calendar, subject to call.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/10/2016
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Education.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|