Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Effective date 8/1/2016.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/16/2016
|
Signed by the Governor. Becomes Act No. 515.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/06/2016
|
Sent to the Governor by the Secretary of the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
06/06/2016
|
Signed by the Speaker of the House.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/05/2016
|
Enrolled. Signed by the President of the Senate.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/03/2016
|
Amendments proposed by the House read and concurred in by a vote of 32 yeas and 1 nays.
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/02/2016
|
Received from the House with amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
06/01/2016
|
Read third time by title, roll called on final passage, yeas 92, nays 7. Finally passed, ordered to the Senate.
|
|
|
House
|
05/26/2016
|
Scheduled for floor debate on 06/01/2016.
|
|
|
House
|
05/25/2016
|
Read by title, amended, passed to 3rd reading.
|
|
|
House
|
05/24/2016
|
Reported with Legislative Bureau amendments.
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2016
|
Reported with amendments (14-0). Referred to the Legislative Bureau.
|
|
|
House
|
05/03/2016
|
Read by title, under the rules, referred to the Committee on Commerce.
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2016
|
Received in the House from the Senate, read by title, lies over under the rules.
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2016
|
Read by title, passed by a vote of 36 yeas and 0 nays, and sent to the House. Motion to reconsider tabled.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2016
|
Read by title. Ordered engrossed and passed to third reading and final passage.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2016
|
Reported favorably.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2016
|
Read second time by title and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Consumer Protection and International Affairs.
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/05/2016
|
Rules suspended. Introduced in the Senate. Read by title and placed on the Calendar for a second reading.
|
|
|